Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marmaduke Lumley

Deceased

Bishop of Lincoln, England


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Dec 1429AppointedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
16 Apr 1430Ordained BishopBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
28 Jan 1450AppointedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
Dec 1450²DiedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marmaduke Lumley:
Bishop Marmaduke Lumley Bishop of Lincoln

  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 19
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 177
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 238
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 289
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 87

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013