Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicholas Close (Cloos)

Deceased

Bishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jan 1450AppointedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
15 Mar 1450Ordained BishopBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
30 Aug 1452AppointedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
Oct 1452³DiedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicholas Close (Cloos):
Bishop Nicholas Close (Cloos) Bishop of Coventry and Lichfield

  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 553
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 135, and Page 170
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 238
  • ob/c23: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 90

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013