Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop György Jakusics

Deceased

Bishop of Eger, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1609¹Born
1625¹16.0Converted
1632²23.0Ordained PriestPriest
163526.0SelectedBishop of Sirmio (Srijem; Sirmium), Croatia
163829.0SelectedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
18 Sep 164536.7AppointedBishop of Eger, Hungary
21 Sep 164536.7Ordained BishopBishop of Eger, Hungary
21 Nov 164738.8DiedBishop of Eger, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for György Jakusics
Bishop György Jakusics (born 1609, died ) Bishop of Eger

EventPlace
Birth PlacePruszka, Diocese of Nitra, Slovakia
Ordained BishopSant'Appolinare, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceEger, Diocese of Eger
Buried Place (Original)Saint Francis, Church, Pruszka, Diocese of Nitra, Slovakia

  • a priest for 15.8 years
  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 73, and Page 317
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 366
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1645, Number 59
  • b/c2: AT, 10 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Feb 2017