Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego de Humansoro Carantía, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Nov 1601³BornAzcoitia, Spain
26 Jan 166058.2AppointedBishop of Santiago de Chile
15 May 166260.5Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Chile
5 Jul 166260.7InstalledBishop of Santiago de Chile
29 May 167674.6DiedBishop of Santiago de Chile

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego de Humansoro Carantía:
Bishop Diego de Humansoro Carantía O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Santiago de Chile

  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 192, Number 1,206

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013