Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mark Sittich Cardinal von Hohenems (Altemps)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Konstanz {Constance}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Aug 1533BornHohenems, Germany
29 May 156026.8AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
26 Feb 156127.6Elevated to Cardinal
10 Mar 156127.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi XII Apostoli
11 May 156127.8ResignedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
6 Oct 156128.2SelectedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
24 Oct 156128.2ConfirmedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
30 Jul 156330.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
1564¹30.4Ordained BishopBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
156531.4AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
15 May 156531.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giorgio in Velabro
3 Oct 157744.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
3 Oct 157845.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
17 Aug 157946.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
5 Dec 158047.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
31 Jul 158956.0ResignedBishop of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany
15 Feb 159561.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Konstanz {Constance}, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mark Sittich von Hohenems (Altemps):
Cardinal Mark Sittich von Hohenems (Altemps) (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Konstanz {Constance}

  • a bishop for 31.1 years
  • a cardinal for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Feb 1561
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 156
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,091

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013