Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Augustin Farah

Deceased

Archbishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

Note/Previous Titular See: (Ordine Basiliano di S. Giovanni Battista dei Greci Melkiti)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1910Born
8 Sep 193727.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Mar 196150.8SelectedBishop of Tripoli del Libano (Melkite Greek)
28 Apr 196150.9ConfirmedBishop of Tripoli del Libano (Melkite Greek)
18 Jun 196151.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tripoli del Libano (Melkite Greek)
18 Nov 196454.5AppointedArchbishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Melkite Greek)
25 Aug 197767.3AppointedArchbishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon
31 Mar 198372.9DiedArchbishop of Zahleh e Furzol (Melkite Greek), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Augustin Farah
Archbishop Augustin Farah (born , died ) Archbishop of Zahleh e Furzol

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKara

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018