Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giambattista Eustachio

Deceased

Bishop of Lucera, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1622¹Born
12 Feb 166341.1AppointedBishop of Lucera, Italy
18 Feb 166341.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lucera, Italy
Sep 1687³65.6DiedBishop of Lucera, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giambattista Eustachio
Bishop Giambattista Eustachio (born 1622, died Sep 1687) Bishop of Lucera

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTroia
Ordained BishopSan Giacomo de spagnoli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 248
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 225
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1663, Number 19
  • ob/c2: AT, 28 Aug 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,027

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018