Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Estefan El-Khazen

Deceased

Archbishop of Damas (Maronite), Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1749²Born
1774¹25.0Ordained PriestPriest
1796¹47.0AppointedBishop
1796¹47.0Ordained BishopBishop
2 Apr 180657.2AppointedArchbishop of Damas (Maronite), Syria
31 Dec 183081.9DiedArchbishop of Damas (Maronite), Syria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Estefan El-Khazen
Archbishop Estefan El-Khazen (born 1749, died ) Archbishop of Damas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlep

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 34.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB, 4 May 2013
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,710
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1796, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018