Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vittorio Nicolino della Chiesa

Deceased

Bishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1626¹Born
16 Mar 166741.2AppointedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
20 Mar 166741.2Ordained BishopBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
22 Sep 169165.7DiedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vittorio Nicolino della Chiesa
Bishop Vittorio Nicolino della Chiesa (born 1626, died ) Bishop of Alba (Pompea)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaufri, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceAlba, Diocese of Alba (Pompea)

  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 75
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1667, Number 31
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Number 19,467

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018