Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Estevam a Jesu Maria da Costa, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop of Angra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1786BornVila de Mafra
27 Jan 181124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
18 Jul 182538.5SelectedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
3 Jul 182639.5ConfirmedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
11 Jun 182740.4Ordained BishopBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
25 Aug 182740.6SelectedBishop of Angra, Portugal
28 Jan 182841.0ConfirmedBishop of Angra, Portugal
21 Sep 185972.7InstalledBishop of Angra, Portugal
28 Jul 187083.5DiedBishop of Angra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Estevam a Jesu Maria da Costa
Bishop Estevam a Jesu Maria da Costa O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop of Angra

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 43.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 77, and Page 368
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1827, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Jun 2016