Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos de São José de Azevedo e Sousa, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Guarda, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1767Born
6 Feb 179123.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
19 Aug 182355.7SelectedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
24 Nov 182356.0ConfirmedBishop of Guarda, Portugal
15 Feb 182456.2Ordained BishopBishop of Guarda, Portugal
5 Apr 182860.4DiedBishop of Guarda, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Carlos de São José de Azevedo e Sousa
Bishop Carlos de São José de Azevedo e Sousa O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Guarda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMejxomil, Diocese of Porto
Ordained BishopBemposta, Chapel, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 37.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.1 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,603
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 184
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 14
  • ob/d: CB, 20 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Feb 2017