Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Jose Ferreira de Sousa

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

Titular Bishop of Lacedaemonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jan 1771BornTinhela
12 Jun 180231.4Ordained PriestPriest
3 May 182453.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
3 May 182453.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lacedaemonia
1833¹62.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Jose Ferreira de Sousa:
Bishop Antonio Jose Ferreira de Sousa (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a priest for 30.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 229

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013