Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Dalmeras

Deceased

Bishop of Vaison


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1587¹BornBagnols sur Ceze
23 Oct 162336.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Vaison, France
23 Oct 162336.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Lydia
28 Oct 162336.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Lydia
13 Dec 162942.9SucceededBishop of Vaison, France
16 May 163346.3DiedBishop of Vaison, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michael Dalmeras:
Bishop Michael Dalmeras (died ) Bishop of Vaison

  • a bishop for 9.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 360, and Page 279
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 80, Number 476
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1623, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 2 Mar 2015