Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco de la Cueva Maldonado

Deceased

Archbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Aug 1662AppointedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
15 Aug 1664Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
15 Oct 1667DiedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Francisco de la Cueva Maldonado
Archbishop Francisco de la Cueva Maldonado (died ) Archbishop of Santo Domingo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpain
Ordained BishopPuerto Rico, Diocese of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espa˝ol, Volume 1,500, Page 197, Number 1,239
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 176
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1664, Number 11
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Number 6,835

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast