Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Comerford, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1586¹Born
12 Feb 162943.1AppointedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
18 Mar 162943.2Ordained BishopBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
10 Mar 165266.1DiedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrick Comerford
Bishop Patrick Comerford O.S.A. (born 1586, died ) Bishop of Waterford and Lismore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWaterford

  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 360
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 90, Number 540
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1629, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018