Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard de Cazilhac (Casilhaco, Casilhac)

Deceased

Bishop of Albi, France


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Dec 1435SelectedBishop of Albi, France
12 Feb 1436Ordained BishopBishop of Albi, France
26 Jan 1453AppointedBishop of Lodève, France
12 Oct 1461AppointedBishop of Albi, France
11 Nov 1462DiedBishop of Albi, France

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Bernard de Cazilhac (Casilhaco, Casilhac)
Bishop Bernard de Cazilhac (Casilhaco, Casilhac) (died ) Bishop of Albi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCazilhac
Ordained BishopBasel, Diocese of Basel, Switzerland
Death PlaceAlbi, Diocese of Albi
Buried Place (Original)Choir, Cathedral, Albi, Diocese of Albi

  • a bishop for 26.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 84
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,745

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 2 Jun 2020

Quantcast