Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hardouin de Bueil

Deceased

Bishop of Angers, France


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jun 1374AppointedBishop of Angers, France
14 Jan 1375Ordained BishopBishop of Angers, France
18 Jan 1439DiedBishop of Angers, France

MicroData Summary for Hardouin de Bueil
Bishop Hardouin de Bueil (died ) Bishop of Angers

  • a bishop for 64.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018