Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michel Cassagnet de Tilladet

Deceased

Bishop of Mâcon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1643¹Born
18 Dec 167633.9SelectedBishop of Mâcon, France
11 Oct 167734.7ConfirmedBishop of Mâcon, France
4 Jun 167835.4Ordained BishopBishop of Mâcon, France
5 Sep 173188.6DiedBishop of Mâcon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michel Cassagnet de Tilladet
Bishop Michel Cassagnet de Tilladet (born 1643, died ) Bishop of Mâcon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 53.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 261
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast