Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Carafa

Deceased

Bishop of Aversa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1584¹BornNapoli
19 Jul 161632.5AppointedBishop of Aversa, Italy
21 Sep 161632.7Ordained BishopBishop of Aversa, Italy
17 Apr 162137.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
9 Sep 162844.6ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Emperor
Apr 1644³60.2DiedBishop of Aversa, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Carafa (VIAF: 56587449)
Bishop Carlo Carafa (born 1584, died Apr 1644) Bishop of Aversa

  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 106
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 61, Number 352
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1616, Number 19
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 259

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Oct 2016