Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martín de Calatayud, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Marta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1501BornCalatayud, Spain
19 Dec 154343.0AppointedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
Dec 154746.9Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
9 Nov 154847.9DiedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Martín de Calatayud:
Bishop Martín de Calatayud O.S.H. (died ) Bishop of Santa Marta

  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013