Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Solano, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cuzco, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1500¹Born
29 Feb 154444.1AppointedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
24 Oct 154646.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cuzco, Peru
1562²62.0ResignedBishop of Cuzco, Peru
14 Jan 158080.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Cuzco, Peru

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Solano
Bishop Juan Solano O.P. (born 1500, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cuzco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArchidona, Diocese of Málaga, Spain
Ordained BishopCathedral, Lima, Archdiocese of Lima

  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 58, Number 322
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 184
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1546, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018