Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Burke (de Burgo), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ossory


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1709¹BornDublin
14 Jun 172415.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
2 Mar 172617.1Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
17 Dec 175849.9SelectedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
9 Jan 175950.0ConfirmedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
22 Apr 175950.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ossory, Ireland
26 Sep 177667.7DiedBishop of Ossory, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Burke (de Burgo)
Bishop Thomas Burke (de Burgo) O.P. (born 1709, died ) Bishop of Ossory

  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Catholic Encyclopedia
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 321
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1759, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016