Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmund O’Doran

Deceased

Bishop of Down and Connor, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1701¹Born
16 Jan 175150.0SelectedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
30 Jan 175150.0ConfirmedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
18 Jun 176059.4DiedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edmund O’Doran
Bishop Edmund O’Doran (born 1701, died ) Bishop of Down and Connor

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDrogheda, Co. Louth
Ordained BishopDrogheda, Co. Louth
Buried Place (Original)"Roofless", Cathedral, Down, Diocese of Down and Connor

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1751, Number 31
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 202
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 95

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast