Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anthony O’Garvey

Deceased

Bishop of Dromore


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Aug 1747SelectedBishop of Dromore, Ireland
1 Sep 1747ConfirmedBishop of Dromore, Ireland
3 Jan 1767DiedBishop of Dromore, Ireland

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Anthony O’Garvey:
Bishop Anthony O’Garvey (died ) Bishop of Dromore

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 201
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015