Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anthony Blake

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1704¹BornDunmacrina
21 Jul 175652.5SelectedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
11 Aug 175652.6ConfirmedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
11 Aug 175652.6AppointedAdministrator of Clonmacnoise, Ireland
19 Apr 175854.2SelectedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
21 Apr 175854.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
29 Nov 178783.9DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Anthony Blake:
Archbishop Anthony Blake (born 1704, died ) Archbishop of Armagh

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 96, and Page 101
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 171
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1756, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015