Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Budi

Deceased

Bishop of Sapė


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1566¹Born
21 Jul 162155.6AppointedBishop of Sapė, Albania
22 Aug 162155.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sapė, Albania
Dec 162256.9DiedBishop of Sapė, Albania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Budi:
Bishop Pietro Budi Bishop of Sapė

  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 305
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 72, Number 424

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013