Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre Bostani

Deceased

Archbishop of Tyr (Maronite), Lebanon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Nov 1819³Born
12 Oct 184222.9Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jul 185636.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Tyr (Maronite), Lebanon
28 Jul 185636.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Achrida
28 Sep 185636.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Achrida
5 Oct 186646.9SucceededArchbishop of Tyr (Maronite), Lebanon
2 Nov 189980.0DiedArchbishop of Tyr (Maronite), Lebanon

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre Bostani (VIAF: 79119650)
Archbishop Pierre Bostani (born Nov 1819, died ) Archbishop of Tyr

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDebbié

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 43.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017