Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Boncompagni

Deceased

Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1592BornSora
19 Apr 162129.2Elevated to Cardinal
17 May 162129.3InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
11 Jul 162230.5AppointedBishop of Fano, Italy
1623²30.9Ordained BishopBishop of Fano, Italy
2 Mar 162634.1AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
16 Mar 162634.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
6 Feb 163442.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
9 Dec 164149.9DiedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Boncompagni:
Cardinal Francesco Boncompagni (born , died ) Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

  • a bishop for 18.9 years
  • a cardinal for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Apr 1621
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,833
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,838

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013