Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antun Becić

Deceased

Bishop of Hvar (Lesina)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1698¹BornBudua
23 Sep 174345.7AppointedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
6 Jan 174547.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
1 Mar 175254.1ResignedBishop of Nicopoli, Bulgaria
13 Apr 175456.2SelectedBishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy
20 May 175456.3ConfirmedBishop of Scardona (Skradin), Italy
13 Jul 175961.5AppointedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
1 Oct 176163.7DiedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antun Becić:
Bishop Antun Becić (born 1698, died ) Bishop of Hvar (Lesina)

  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 310, and Page 336
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 369
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1745, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 27 Nov 2015