Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Alcock

Deceased

Bishop of Ely, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1430BornBeverley, Yorkshire
8 Jan 147242.0AppointedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
15 Mar 147242.2Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
15 Jul 147646.5AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
6 Oct 148656.8AppointedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain
1 Oct 150070.8DiedBishop of Ely, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Alcock:
Bishop John Alcock (died ) Bishop of Ely

  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 340
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 150, and Page 224
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 568
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 61
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 268
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 92

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013