Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Hill

Deceased

Bishop of London, England


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Aug 1489SelectedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
21 Aug 1489ConfirmedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
15 Nov 1489Ordained BishopBishop of London, England, Great Britain
20 Feb 1496DiedBishop of London, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard Hill:
Bishop Richard Hill (died ) Bishop of London

  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 297
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 180
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013