Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Langton

Deceased

Bishop of Salisbury, England

Bishop of Winchester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Jul 1483AppointedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
7 Sep 1483Ordained BishopBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
9 Feb 1485AppointedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
13 Mar 1493AppointedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
22 Jan 1501SelectedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
27 Jan 1501DiedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Thomas Langton:
Bishop Thomas Langton (died ) Bishop of Salisbury

  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Google Books
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 24, and Page 299
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 190, and Page 230
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 604
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 269
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 16
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 93

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013