Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Etienne-Raymond Albrand, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Kuiceu, China

Titular Bishop of Sura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1805Born
19 Jun 182924.1Ordained PriestPriest
3 Dec 183126.5ProfessedPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
13 Aug 184641.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kuiceu, China
24 Feb 184943.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sura
18 Mar 184943.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sura
22 Apr 185347.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Kuiceu, China

MicroData Summary for Etienne-Raymond Albrand (VIAF: 316439944)
Bishop Etienne-Raymond Albrand M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Kuiceu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Crépin, Diocese of Gap, France
Ordained BishopPee-ho-chou
Death PlaceKouy-Yang

  • a priest for 23.8 years
  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 529
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,849, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast