Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Alberti di Poja

Deceased

Bishop of Trento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1610³Born
29 May 163828.0Ordained PriestPriest of Trento, Italy
3 Apr 167766.8SelectedBishop of Trento, Italy
3 Oct 167868.3ConfirmedBishop of Trento, Italy
20 Nov 167868.4Ordained BishopBishop of Trento, Italy
4 Feb 168978.7DiedBishop of Trento, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Alberti di Poja
Bishop Francesco Alberti di Poja (born , died ) Bishop of Trento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrento, Diocese of Trento
Ordained BishopSan Vigilio, Cathedral, Trento, Diocese of Trento
Death PlaceTrento, Diocese of Trento

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 390
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1678, Number 32
  • ob/c2+: AT, 3 Jun 2019
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 240, Number 20,138
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 55, Number 3,949

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 15 Jul 2020

Quantcast