Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Johann Cardinal von Bucka (Železný), O. Praem. †

Deceased

Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czechia

Cardinal-Priest of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane

Administrator of Praha {Prague}

Administrator of Vác


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1360¹Born
1389²29.0AppointedBishop of Litomyšl, Czechia
28 Apr 138929.3Ordained BishopBishop of Litomyšl, Czechia
21 Sep 141656.7SelectedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czechia
14 Feb 141858.1ConfirmedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czechia
13 Aug 142161.6AppointedAdministrator of Praha {Prague}, Czechia
24 May 142666.3Elevated to Cardinal
27 May 142666.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane
1429²69.0AppointedAdministrator of Vác, Hungary
9 Oct 143070.7DiedBishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czechia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann von Bucka (Železný)
Johann Cardinal von Bucka (Železný) O. Praem. (born 1360, died ) Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePraha, Archdiocese of Praha {Prague}
Death PlaceEsztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom, Hungary
Buried Place (Original)Franciscan, Church, Vác, Diocese of Vác, Hungary

  • a bishop for 41.4 years
  • a cardinal for 4.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 376, and Page 409
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 318
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 May 1426

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Aug 2021

Quantcast