Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Woodlock, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Jan 1305AppointedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
30 May 1305Ordained BishopBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
28 Jun 1316DiedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Henry Woodlock
Bishop Henry Woodlock O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Winchester

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCanterbury, Archdiocese of Canterbury, England

  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 530
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 70
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 12
  • osb: CB, 20 Mar 2016
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,937

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast