Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Krzysztof Stefan Włodarczyk

Bishop of Bydgoszcz, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1961 Born
22 Jun 198625.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg, Poland
21 Jun 198726.3Ordained PriestPriest of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg, Poland
7 May 201655.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg, Poland
7 May 201655.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Surista
11 Jun 201655.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Surista
21 Sep 202160.5AppointedBishop of Bydgoszcz, Poland
28 Sep 202160.5InstalledBishop of Bydgoszcz, Poland

MicroData Summary for Krzysztof Stefan Włodarczyk
Bishop Krzysztof Stefan Włodarczyk (born ) Bishop of Bydgoszcz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSławno, Diocese of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg
Ordained BishopCo-Cathedral, Kolobrzeg, Diocese of Koszalin-Kołobrzeg

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bydgoszcz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 May 2016
  • ob: CB, 7 May 2016
  • c2+: CB, 11 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,938
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2021
  • i: CB, 21 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 21 Sep 2021

Quantcast