Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Winterl, S.J. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1728Born
14 Oct 174416.6ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
177344.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
30 Aug 179062.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary

MicroData Summary for Josef Winterl
Bishop Josef Winterl S.J. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSteyr

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast