Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guillaume de Vienne, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen, France


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Feb 1379AppointedBishop of Autun, France
26 Aug 1387AppointedBishop of Beauvais, France
29 Mar 1389AppointedArchbishop of Rouen, France
18 Feb 1407DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume de Vienne
Archbishop Guillaume de Vienne O.S.B. (died ) Archbishop of Rouen

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 426, and Page 132
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Feb 2021

Quantcast