Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Manuel Vieira

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Osasco, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1925Born
8 Dec 195227.1Ordained PriestPriest of São Paulo, Brazil
12 Dec 197449.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil
12 Dec 197449.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
25 Jan 197549.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
15 Mar 198963.3AppointedBishop of Osasco, Sao Paulo, Brazil
24 Apr 200276.4RetiredBishop of Osasco, Sao Paulo, Brazil
23 Dec 201388.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Osasco, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco Manuel Vieira
Bishop Francisco Manuel Vieira (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Osasco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRio Tinto
Ordained BishopCathedral, São Paulo, Archdiocese of São Paulo

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 23 Dec 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 27, Number 1,529

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 May 2021

Quantcast