Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jacques Cardinal de Via

Deceased

Administrator of Avignon, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Feb 1313AppointedBishop of Avignon, France
17 Dec 1316AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
17 Dec 1316Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 1316AppointedAdministrator of Avignon, France
13 Jun 1317DiedAdministrator of Avignon, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques de Via
Jacques Cardinal de Via (died ) Administrator of Avignon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCahors, Diocese of Cahors
Death PlaceAvignon, Diocese of Avignon
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Avignon, Diocese of Avignon

  • a cardinal for .4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Dec 1316
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 123

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Mar 2021

Quantcast