Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giacomo Veneri de Racaneto

Deceased

Archbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Sep 1440AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
18 Sep 1440Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
2 Sep 1460DiedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Veneri de Racaneto
Archbishop Giacomo Veneri de Racaneto (died ) Archbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 220
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,746

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 19 Jun 2021

Quantcast