Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexander de Vaus

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Whithorn-Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
4 May 1414AppointedBishop of Caithness, Scotland, Great Britain
4 May 1414AppointedApostolic Administrator of Orkney (Kirkwall), Scotland, Great Britain
13 Nov 1415CeasedApostolic Administrator of Orkney (Kirkwall), Scotland, Great Britain
4 Dec 1422AppointedBishop of Whithorn-Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain
1450¹ResignedBishop of Whithorn-Galloway, Scotland, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alexander de Vaus
Bishop Alexander de Vaus , Bishop Emeritus of Whithorn-Galloway

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 176, and Page 162
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 378
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 116

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 Jul 2021

Quantcast