Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Michele Vaglio

Deceased

Bishop of Venosa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1783Born
21 Feb 180724.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 Oct 184865.6SelectedBishop of Venosa, Italy
22 Dec 184865.9ConfirmedBishop of Venosa, Italy
1849¹65.9Ordained BishopBishop of Venosa, Italy
28 Jul 186582.5DiedBishop of Venosa, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Michele Vaglio
Bishop Antonio Michele Vaglio (born , died ) Bishop of Venosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGalatone, Diocese of Nard˛

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 585
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1849, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast