Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mauricio Urrea Carrillo

Bishop of Parral, Chihuahua, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1969 Born
5 Feb 200434.5Ordained PriestPriest of Hermosillo, Sonora, México
19 Mar 201545.7IncardinatedPriest of Nogales, Sonora, México
21 Nov 202051.3AppointedBishop of Parral, Chihuahua, México
19 Mar 202151.7Ordained BishopBishop of Parral, Chihuahua, México

MicroData Summary for Mauricio Urrea Carrillo
Bishop Mauricio Urrea Carrillo (born ) Bishop of Parral

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNogales, Archdiocese of Hermosillo, Sonora
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de Guadalupe, Cathedral, Parral, Diocese of Parral, Chihuahua

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Parral.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2020
  • ob: CB, 22 Nov 2020
  • ~ob: CB, 4 Dec 2020
  • ob: CB, 9 Jan 2021
  • c2+: CB, 9 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 19 Mar 2021

Quantcast