Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guercio Tebalducci

Deceased

Bishop of Lucca, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Dec 1236AppointedBishop of Lucca, Italy
16 May 1237³Ordained BishopBishop of Lucca, Italy
22 Nov 1256DiedBishop of Lucca, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guercio Tebalducci
Bishop Guercio Tebalducci (died ) Bishop of Lucca

  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,361
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 313

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Jul 2021

Quantcast