Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Deepak Valerian Tauro

Auxiliary Bishop of Delhi, India

Titular Bishop of Buleliana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1967 Born
10 May 199628.7Ordained PriestPriest of Muzaffarpur, India
16 Jul 202153.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Delhi, India
16 Jul 202153.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Buleliana
29 Sep 202154.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Buleliana

MicroData Summary for Deepak Valerian Tauro
Bishop Deepak Valerian Tauro (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Delhi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChikmagalur, Karnataka
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Cathedral, New Delhi, Archdiocese of Delhi

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Delhi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2021
  • ob: CB, 20 Sep 2021
  • c2+: CB, 29 Sep 2021
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 249, Number 20,765

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Oct 2021

Quantcast