Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Tanzi, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Trieste, Italy

Bishop of Belluno e Feltre

Note/Previous Titular See: (or O.E.S.A.)


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Jun 1322AppointedBishop of Sorres (Sorra), Italy
6 Jun 1323AppointedBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
5 Jul 1324AppointedAdministrator of Trieste, Italy
1326¹DiedBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Tanzi
Bishop Gregorio Tanzi O.P. (died 1326) Bishop of Trieste

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 477, and Page 132
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 458

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 May 2021

Quantcast