Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Strada

Deceased

Bishop of Forli, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Feb 1406AppointedBishop of Comacchio, Italy
Apr 1414³AppointedBishop of Forli, Italy
3 Jun 1414³Ordained BishopBishop of Forli, Italy
1427²DiedBishop of Forli, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Strada
Bishop Giovanni Strada (died 1427) Bishop of Forli

  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob/c2: CB, 31 Jan 2014
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 253, and Page 199
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 31 Jul 2021

Quantcast