Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Snell

Deceased

Bishop of Ossory, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
26 May 1400AppointedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
11 Mar 1407AppointedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
16 Oct 1416DiedBishop of Ossory, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Thomas Snell
Bishop Thomas Snell (died ) Bishop of Ossory

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 308, and Page 381

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 10 May 2021

Quantcast